Pineida v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Pineida
Defendant: E. Evans, Charles D. Lee, Kathleen Wall, Carl Millner, R. Rodrigues, Loy Medina and M. Supulveda
Case Number: 3:2012cv01171
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Request to Dismiss Defendant Grounds filed by R. T.C. Grounds; 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to dismiss defendants filed by R. T.C. Grounds, Darren Bright, M. Supulveda, Anise Adams, R. Rodriguez, Charles D. Lee, Kathleen Wall, Brian Marshall, Carl Millner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 1/19/2016. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Case Pending Settlement filed by Gabriel Pineida. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 4, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 5/14/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Parties largely resolved their dispute and read an agreement into the record on 5/5/2015. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Re Discovery Procedures by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 160 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Document Subpoena to Salinas Valley State Prison filed by Gabriel Pineida. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 118 Motion to Dismiss; denying 131 Motion to Dismiss; denying 134 Motion to Dismiss; denying 136 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 150 Notice filed by Gabriel Pineida. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 136 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER RULE 12(b) MOTION to Strike UNDER RULE 12(f); 134 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER R ULE 12(c) AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER RULE 12(f); 118 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER RULE 12(b); 131 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 7, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 134 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER RULE 12(c);AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER RULE 12(f) filed by R. T.C. Grounds, Darren Bright, M. Supulveda, Anise Adams, Kathleen Wall, R. Rodriguez, Charles D. Lee, 131 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carl E. Millner, M.D., 136 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER RULE 12(b) MOTION to Strike UNDER RULE 12(f) filed by R. T.C. Grounds, Darren Bright, M. Supulveda, Anise Adams, R. Rodriguez, Charles D. Lee, Kathleen Wall, Brian Marshall, 118 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER RULE 12(b) filed by M. Supulveda, R. Rodriguez, Charles D. Lee, Kathleen Wall. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 138 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re FILING OF CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SCHEDULING MOTIONS TO DISMISS (JOINT) filed by Gabriel Pineida. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 23, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER NOTING WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH re 104 MOTION to Quash filed by Carl Millner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM JUNE 3 TO JULY 23. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT ELOY MEDINA re 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation) to Dismiss Defendant Eloy Medina filed by Gabriel Pineida. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 20, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 86 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Gabriel Pineida. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 12, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/24/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/5/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER SUA SPONTE GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 17, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference, Status Conference and Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/09/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/23/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Certificate of Service. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/3/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pineida v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Pineida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Millner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loy Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Supulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?