Keirsey v. eBay, Inc
Plaintiff: Tasha Keirsey
Defendant: eBay, Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv01200
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #79 Motion TO APPROVE CY PRES DISTRIBUTIONS, TERMINATE SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION, AND DISCHARGE CLASS COUNSEL AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
July 7, 2015 Filing 79 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO APPROVE CY PRES DISTRIBUTIONS, TERMINATE SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION, AND DISCHARGE CLASS COUNSEL AND SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR re #77 Order on Motion for Settlement filed by Tasha Keirsey. Responses due by 7/21/2015. Replies due by 7/28/2015. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE INCENTIVE COMPENSATION AWARDS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part #68 Motion for Attorney Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER FINALLY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting #74 Motion for Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 76 Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held on 2/12/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 2/13/2014), Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 2/13/2014) re #74 Joint MOTION for Settlement JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FINALLY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Tasha Keirsey; #68 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 75 Declaration of Keith R. Verges in Support of re #74 Joint MOTION for Settlement; JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FINALLY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Related document(s) #74 ) (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 74 Joint MOTION for Settlement; JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER FINALLY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Tasha Keirsey. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/20/2014. Replies due by 2/27/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Dahl, #2 Exhibit 1 - Email Notice of Class Action Settlement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mail Postcard Notice of Class Action Settlement, #4 Exhibit 3 - Settlement Website Pages, #5 Exhibit 4 - Class Member Opt Out List, #6 Proposed Order)(Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #71 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 72 Declaration of Brian Hsu in Support of #71 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DECLARATION OF BRIAN HSU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL [ECF NO. 71] filed byeBay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal)(Related document(s) #71 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 71 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raymond Walker re Admin Mo Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Joint Motion, #4 Unredated Joint Motion, #5 Declaration of J. Dahl - Redacted, #6 Declaration of J. Dahl - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit 1 - Dahl Decl. - Email Notice of Class Action Settlement, #8 Exhibit 2 - Dahl Decl. - Mail Postcard Notice of Class Action Settlement, #9 Exhibit 3 - Dahl Decl. - Settlement Website Pages, #10 Exhibit 4 - Dahl Decl. - Class Member Opt Out List, #11 Declaration Keith Verges re Mo Final Approval of Settlement, #12 Proposed Order Final Order and Judgment Approving Class Action Settlement)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
December 6, 2013 Filing 70 [Proposed] Order Granting re #68 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees, and Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Young, Parker) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 69 Declaration of Parker D. Young in Support of re #68 MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, and Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #68 ) (Young, Parker) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Award of Attorneys' Fees, and Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Tasha Keirsey. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/20/2013. Replies due by 12/27/2013. (Young, Parker) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING A SETTLEMENT CLASS AND PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting #63 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 23, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #67 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING A SETTLEMENT CLASS AND PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Fairness Hearing set for 2/13/2014 at 2:00 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 66 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #62 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Declaration Of Krishna Vasireddy In Support Of Motion For Order (1) Conditionally Certifying A Settlement Class And Related Settlement; (2) Authorizing Distribution Of Notice Of Settlement; And (3) Setting A Scheduling For The Final Approval Process by eBay, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 65 Declaration of Krishna Vasireddy in Support of re #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement; [REDACTED] Joint Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order (1) Conditionally Certifying A Settlement Class And Related Settlement; (2) Authorizing Distribution Of Notice Of Settlement; And (3) Setting A Scheduling For The Final Approval Process, Memorandum of Points & Authorities, re #62 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, re [REDACTED] Vasireddy Declaration In Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by eBay, Inc. (Related document(s) #63 , #62 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 64 Declaration of Keith Verges in Support of re #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement; [REDACTED] Joint Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order (1) Conditionally Certifying A Settlement Class And Related Settlement; (2) Authorizing Distribution Of Notice Of Settlement; And (3) Setting A Scheduling For The Final Approval Process, Memorandum of Points & Authorities; re #62 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by eBay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #63 , #62 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Settlement; [REDACTED] Joint Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order (1) Conditionally Certifying A Settlement Class And Related Settlement; (2) Authorizing Distribution Of Notice Of Settlement; And (3) Setting A Scheduling For The Final Approval Process, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed by eBay, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/4/2013. Replies due by 9/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part #58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part #59 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 61 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 10/10/2013) re #53 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Tasha Keirsey, eBay, Inc. (Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting #57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 59 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT EBAY INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL [DKT. NO. 58] filed by eBay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRIAN HSU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL [DKT. NO. 58] AND EBAY'S SUPPLEMENTAL ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REGARDING HEARING SCHEDULE ON JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT APPROVAL re #53 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING as to #53 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Judge Tigar hears law and motion on Thursdays. The hearing previously noticed for 10/9/2013 is CONTINUED to 10/10/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 54 Declaration of Keith Verges in Support of re #53 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - F&D Firm resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Class Action Lawsuits, #3 Exhibit 3 - Atty Biographies)(Related document(s) #53 ) (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 53 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order (1) Conditionally Certifying a Settlement Class & Related Settlement; (2) Authorizing Distribution of Notice of Settlement; and (3) Setting a Scheduling for the Final Approval Process; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Tasha Keirsey, eBay, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/4/2013. Replies due by 9/11/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agmt, #2 Exhibit 1A - Legal Notice, #3 Exhibit 1B - Proposed Prelim. Approval Order, #4 Exhibit 1C - Summary Notice)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 52 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #50 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, DECLARATION OF KEITH VERGES by Tasha Keirsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - F&D Firm resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Class Action Suits, #3 Exhibit 3 - Atty Biographies)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 51 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #50 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Tasha Keirsey, eBay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agmt, #2 Exhibit 1A - Legal Notice, #3 Exhibit 1B - proposed Prelim. Approval Order, #4 Exhibit 1C - Summary Notice)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting re #48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting re #49 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 49 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; DEFENDANT EBAY INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL [DKT. NO. 48] filed by eBay, Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration BRIAN HSU, #(2) [Proposed] Order, #(3) Certificate/Proof of Service) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO FILE SETTLEMENT re #46 NOTICE by Tasha Keirsey Regarding Settlement. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 28, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE filed by Tasha Keirsey Regarding Settlement (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 26, 2013 Filing 44 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Tasha Keirsey, eBay, Inc. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 2/11/2013. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #40 STIPULATION CLARIFYING SELECTED ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 Filing 41 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-7-12, before Judge Jeffrey S. White-. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 8, 2012 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CLARIFYING SELECTED ADR PROCESS filed by eBay, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/8/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 39 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/7/2012 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 9/7/2012). Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2013. Discovery due by 5/31/2013. Class Certification Hearing set for 9/13/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/7/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #30 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
August 31, 2012 Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Tasha Keirsey, eBay, Inc. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 20, 2012 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT EBAY INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT byeBay, Inc. (Sardo, Raimondo) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by eBay, Inc (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER VACATING ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO SAN JOSE DIVISION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 12, 2012 Filing 31 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) filed byeBay, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by eBay, Inc filed by eBay, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 29 RESPONSE to re #23 Request for Judicial Notice by Tasha Keirsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bechtold Decl re Opposition to Mo Compel, #2 Exhibit B - Bechtold Decl re Opposition to Mo Class Cert, #3 Exhibit C - Supp Decl Bruntz re Opposition to Mo Compel, #4 Declaration - R. Walker, #5 Exhibit D - iPhone eBay Mobile License Agmt, #6 Exhibit E - iPad eBay Mobile License Agmt)(Verges, Keith) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 28 RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint ) filed byTasha Keirsey. (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 8, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/12/2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 26 Proposed Order re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint by eBay, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 25 Declaration of Elizabeth Hartrich in Support of #23 Request for Judicial Notice filed byeBay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 24 Declaration of Margaret MacDonald in Support of #23 Request for Judicial Notice filed byeBay, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed byeBay, Inc. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by eBay, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 5/21/2012. Replies due by 5/29/2012. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Walker, Raymond) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (CIVIL L.R. 6-1(A)); STIPULATED REQUEST TO CHANGE DATE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CIVIL L.R. 6-2). Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 6, 2012 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, #17 Initial Scheduling Order, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (CIVIL L.R. 6-1(A)); STIPULATED REQUEST TO CHANGE DATE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CIVIL L.R. 6-2) filed by eBay, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tasha Keirsey re #17 Initial Scheduling Order, (Verges, Keith) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Keith R. Verges (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Raymond E. Walker (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Parker D. Young (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 3/14/2012. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 3/14/2012. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 6/5/2012 Case Management Conference is hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 12, 2012 Filing 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Tasha Keirsey (Leuthold, Shawn) (Filed on 3/12/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2012 Filing 9 Application for Admission of Attorney Keith R. Verges for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6654106.) filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order) (Leuthold, Shawn) (Filed on 3/12/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2012 Filing 8 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to eBay, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 6 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Parker D. Young for Leave to appear Pro Hac Vice re #5 by Tasha Keirsey. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 5 Application for Admission of Attorney Parker D. Young for Leave to appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611011483) Filing fee previously paid on 3/9/2012 filed by Tasha Keirsey. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 4 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Raymond E. Walker for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re #3 by Tasha Keirsey. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 3 Application for Admission of Attorney Raymond E. Walker for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 54611011483) Filing fee previously paid on 3/9/2012 filed by Tasha Keirsey. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Tasha Keirsey (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012) Modified on 6/26/2012 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2012 Filing 1 Alleged Class Action Complaint against eBay, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 546110114823). Filed by Tasha Keirsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keirsey v. eBay, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Keirsey
Represented By: Shawn Tenzing Leuthold
Represented By: Parker D Young
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Keith R Verges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Raimondo Andre Sardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?