Eisner v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Debra J. Eisner
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Surgical Care Affiliates Long Term Disability Plan and Surgical Care Affiliates
Case Number: 3:2012cv01238
Filed: March 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER APPROVING PARTIES' STIPULATION REGARDING REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND CLOSING CASE re 71 Judgment; 73 Stipulation and Order; 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Plaintiff's Reasonable Attorneys 9; Fees and Costs filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America; 75 Satisfaction of Judgment, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT REPORT AND STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Debra J. Eisner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING BENCH TRIAL AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2013 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 11/15/2013 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Jon S. Tigar in Courtroom 2, Fourth Floor, 1301 Clay St., Oakland, California. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CONTRACTUAL ISSUE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
May 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER DATED APRIL 15, 2013 re 33 Letter filed by Debra J. Eisner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 19 STIPULATION re: Initial Case Management Conference Pending Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 STIPULATION Dismissing Certain Parties and Claims. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/15/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/19/12. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eisner v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgical Care Affiliates Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgical Care Affiliates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra J. Eisner
Represented By: Julian M. Baum
Represented By: Lisa Ann Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?