J & J Sports Productions, Inc v. Lozano et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc
Defendant: Charlemaine G. Lozano and C.C. Lozano, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv01247
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND STATUTORY DAMAGES by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Default Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 13 Order on Ex Parte Application]. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/10/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (to 7/12/2012 at 11:00 AM) by Judge William Alsup [granting 12 Ex Parte Application]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/23/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc v. Lozano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlemaine G. Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C. Lozano, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?