Palm v. Sur La Table, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron Palm
Defendant: Sur La Table, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01250
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 Proposed Order AND Stipulation To Extend Time to File Preliminary Approval Motion and Continue Case Management Conference. filed by Aaron Palm Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/2/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2013. Motion for Preliminary Approval shall be filed before the next case management conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/19/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation and Proposed Order To Continue Class Certification and Pre-Trial Deadlines filed by Aaron Palm. Class Cert motion due by 9/27/2013. Class Cert Replies due by 12/6/2013. Class Cert Opposition/ Responses due by 11/8/2013. Class Cert Motion hearing: date and time to be determined by the Court. All other dates remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/15/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT and PRETRIAL ORDER. A further Case Management Conference is set for 09/28/2012 at 1:30 p.m.; Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2013 at 1:30 p.m.; Jury Trial set for 12/10/2013 at 8:30 a.m.; Dispositive Motions to be heard on 08/23/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 07/02/2012. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/28/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm v. Sur La Table, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sur La Table, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Louis Berde
Represented By: Lynn Hang
Represented By: Michele Leigh Maryott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Palm
Represented By: David C Lipps
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?