Friends of Scotland, Inc. v. Carroll
Plaintiff: Friends of Scotland, Inc.
Defendant: Geoffrey Scott Carroll
Case Number: 3:2012cv01255
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 23 Motion to Transfer Case]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITIONS re 34 Letter filed by Geoffrey Scott Carroll (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND RESETTING HEARING DATE re 23 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Geoffrey Scott Carroll, 32 Objection, filed by Friends of Scotland, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 23 MOTION to Transfe r Case , 32 Objection,. Replies due by 2/26/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/10/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/13/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Scotland, Inc. v. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Scott Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Scotland, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew McMahon
Represented By: Bruce Charles Piontkowski
Represented By: Curtis R. Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?