Phelan v. Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: John C. Phelan
Defendant: Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01309
Filed: March 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re 49 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by John C. Phelan. Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 19, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 37 filed by John C. Phelan. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTION HEARING AND CMC Re 27 re 22 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phelan v. Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeway Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Phelan
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Lopatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?