Continental Appliances, Inc. v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Continental Appliances, Inc.
Defendant: John Adams, Michael Scott Mulberry and John Thomas
Case Number: 3:2012cv01310
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 for Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) filed by Continental Appliances, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting motion and CMC to 12/14/12 at 1:30 p.m. 54 47 MOTION to Strike 6 Amended Complaint Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure §425.16. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2012. Case M anagement Conference set for 12/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 08/24/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR 8/10/12 re 30 Reply to Opposition/Response,, 25 Opposition/Response to Motion, 26 Declaration in Support, 29 Declaration in Support, 28 Declaration in Support, 31 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Supp, 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ., STIPULATION AND ORDER Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/5/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Appliances, Inc. v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Mulberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Appliances, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Duan
Represented By: Michael K. Friedland
Represented By: Lauren Jennifer Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?