Barnes et al v. The Hershey Company
Plaintiff: Gregory P. Barnes, David C. Bolle and Mary D. Wasson
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv01334
Filed: March 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION ON PATTERN AND PRACTICE AND DISPARATE IMPACT CLAIMS. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL re: 325 : Pretrial Conference reset for 2/11/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Selection and Jury Trial reset for 2/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/8/2015. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request to File a Surreply By December 9, 2015. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Multiple Summary Judgment Motions in Excess of Page Limits by Judge Charles R. Breyer (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015).
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Order Rejecting Separate Summary Judgment Motions Filed in Violation of Standing Orders by Judge Charles R. Breyer; vacating 277 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; vacating 278 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; vacating 279 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; vacating 284 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 229 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 236 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER,granting 274 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL filed by The Hershey Company. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting administrative motion to seal. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 247 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 248 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 210 MOTION for Hearing filed by The Hershey Company. Status Conference set for 1/16/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/13/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER ON ESI DISPUTE Re: Dkt. Nos. 161, 194 by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 190 Objection, filed by David C. Bolle, Jerry M. Chapman, Gregory P. Barnes, Mary D. Wasson. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/7/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Re: Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Leave to Respond to Plaintiffs' Objections by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying without prejudice 150 Motion for Summary Judgment; denied as moot 195 Motion for Leave to File Response. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER OF TENTATIVE RULING RE: ESI DISPUTE Re: Dkt. Nos. 161, 194. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/30/2014. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 183 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER RESOLVING DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Re: Dkt. Nos. 165, 166 (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER TO FILE PROPOSED ORDERS RE: 165 165 by 9/2/2014 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/29/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER, Reset Deadlines as to 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., granting 162 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CONTINUING OCTOBER 10 , 2014 HEARING DATE TO OCTOBER 17, 2014 filed by The Hershey Company. Responses due by 9/3/2014. Replies due by 9/16/2014. Motion Hearing reset for 10/17/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/20/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RESOLVING DISCOVERY DISPUTES RE: 124 136 137 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/16/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re 121 Status Report. The parties' joint discovery letter brief is due 3/14/2014. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 3/5/2014. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER RESOLVING DISCOVERY DISPUTES Re: Dkt. Nos. 113 , 114 . Parties are to jointly report by March 5, 2014, on the status of this discovery, setting forth in their report any disputed issues. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/7/2014. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 97 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO JOIN JERRY M. CHAPMAN AND TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS ACCORDINGLY filed by David C. Bolle, Gregory P. Barnes, Mary D. Wasson. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/15/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF COLLECTIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by The Hershey Company re 63 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL COLLECTIVE ACTION CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE TO PUTATIVE COLLECTI VE ACTION MEMBERS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. § 216(B) Motion Hearing reset for 2/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/8/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER continuing the CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2012. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/24/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/29/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 5/4/2012. Replies due by 5/18/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/19/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. The Hershey Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory P. Barnes
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Bolle
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary D. Wasson
Represented By: Thomas J. Brandi
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hershey Company
Represented By: Daryl Steven Landy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?