Hughes v. Cido Shipping (H.K.) Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: John Hughes
Defendant: Cido Shipping (H.K.) Co., Ltd. and Cido Shipping (Korea) Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01397
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/6/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/29/2013 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/6/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING re 29 Letter filed by John Hughes for William Turley to appear by phone on 3/1/13 at 1:30 PM for the further case management conference.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 2/26/2013. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING re 23 Letter filed by John Hughes for William Turley to appear by phone on 11/30/12 at 1:30 PM.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING re 20 Notice of Appearance/ Substitution of Attorney filed by John Hughes. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/26/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING re 19 Letter filed by Cido Shipping (Korea) Co., Ltd., for Eric Danoff, counsel for Dft, to appear by phone on 11/30/12 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/26/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Cido Shipping (H.K.) Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hughes
Represented By: Daniel Ross Weltin
Represented By: Philip Ross Weltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cido Shipping (H.K.) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cido Shipping (Korea) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?