Jones v. City of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Tony Ray Jones
Defendant: City of Oakland and Cesar Garcia
Case Number: 3:2012cv01416
Filed: March 21, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Discovery Order re: 48 Second Discovery Letter Brief, Joint Statement of Discovery Issues in Dispute filed by Tony Ray Jones.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/12/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Requiring Telephonic Appearance of Plaintiff. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Discovery Order re Garcia deposition. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/19/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 35 Stipulation; granting 38 Stipulated Protective Order. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part 19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Third, Fourth, Ninth, and Fifteenth casues of action; Denying as Moot as to Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action; Vacating May 9, 2013 hearing. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 31 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/18/2013 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/25/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 25 Stipulation re: Deposition of plaintiff Tony Ray Jones in Alameda County Jail. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 23 Stipulation to allow medical examination of plaintiff in Santa Rita Jail. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 16 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Completion date. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Ray Jones
Represented By: Waukeen Quandrico McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Garcia
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?