Department of Fair Employment and Housing v. Alere Home Monitoring, Inc.

Defendant: Alere Home Monitoring, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Karen Fernandez
Plaintiff: Department of Fair Employment and Housing
Case Number: 3:2012cv01443
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/27/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
September 27, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/27/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
December 14, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/14/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Department of Fair Employment and Housing v. Alere Home Monitoring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alere Home Monitoring, Inc.
Represented By: Eran Marie Bermudez
Represented By: Nadia Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Karen Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Department of Fair Employment and Housing
Represented By: Allison M. Nobert
Represented By: Nelson Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.