Johnson v. Sunhill Enterprises, LP
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Defendant: Sunhill Enterprises, LP
Case Number: 3:2012cv01458
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/16/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL FOR FULL-SCOPE PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on May 12, 2014. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 19 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Sunhill Enterprises, LP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/26/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Sunhill Enterprises, LP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/25/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing the Complaint filed by David Johnson. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 9, 2013. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Sunhill Enterprises, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunhill Enterprises, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Nelson Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?