Clorox Company v. Industrias Alen, S.A. DE C.V. et al
Plaintiff: Clorox Company
Defendant: Industrias Alen, S.A. DE C.V. and Alen USA, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01468
Filed: March 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER/STIPULATION DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/3/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING re 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Declarations filed by Clorox Company. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/26/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER regarding March 22, 2013 discovery hearing. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Motions due by 5/31/2013. Replies due by 6/12/2013. Responses due by 6/28/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Fra ncisco. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 12/2/13 at 8:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/15/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING re 42 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Alen USA, L.P., Industrias Alen, S.A. DE C.V. Attorney R David Donoghue terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/31/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER as to 29 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing re-set for 9/7/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2012. Case Management Conference re-set for 9/7/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/10/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/27/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clorox Company v. Industrias Alen, S.A. DE C.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clorox Company
Represented By: Martin R. Glick
Represented By: Sarah Jean Givan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrias Alen, S.A. DE C.V.
Represented By: R David Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alen USA, L.P.
Represented By: R David Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?