Cornerstone Staffing Solutions, Inc. v. James et al
Plaintiff: Cornerstone Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Larry Thaxter James, David R. Batton, Ted Mannello, Andre Douzdjian, Michael Santos, Marcos Barrera, Batton TechnicalEngineering Consultants, Inc., Hanbon-Caro I, LLC, Hanbon--MI I, LLC, Hanbon--MI II, Inc., Hanbon--Marlette, LLC, Hanbon--PA I, LLC, Hanbon-CT I, LLC, Tec Group, Inc., Deploy Hr, Inc. and Deployhr, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01527
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 457 Plaintiff's Application for Order Directing the Release of Funds Posted as Security as Modified by The Court. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 455 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 451 FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/21/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/24/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Selection set for 8/31/2015 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 8/31/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER re 413 granting substitution of attorney. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/26/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 367 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 364 TO DISMISS DEFENDANT MICHAEL SANTOS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/13/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 290 Motion to Amend/Correct. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ONE DAY EXTENSION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MANDATING FURTHER DISCLOSURE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2014: # 1 "Exhibit 4") (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES; Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2014 01:30 PM; Jury Selection set for 5/27/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 5/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER GRANTING re 246 Letter (Motion to Compel) filed by Andre Douzdjian. Plaintiff shall fully answer interrogatories 3-4 and 7-12 within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/4/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY MOTION FILING DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/27/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND CUT OFF DATES FOR FACT DEPOSITIONS AND EXPERT DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Discovery Order re: 225 and 226 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 5, 2013. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/21/13.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO MARCOS BARRERA SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM by Judge Richard Seeborg, granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion to Strike Portions of 146 First Amended Counterclaim. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MODIFY THE JULY 20, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/10/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/21/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TIMING OF EXPERT DISCLOSURES, COMPLETION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/6/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/3/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION TO AMEND THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADVANCE DATE FOR THE HEARING ON THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO ACCOMMODATE MEDICAL PROCEDURE OF PLAINTIFF'S PRINCIPAL, MARY ANDERSON AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 63 TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 10/28/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 10/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, Before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 42 PERSONAL APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/28/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012) Modified on 4/10/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 4/9/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornerstone Staffing Solutions, Inc. v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornerstone Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Clayton J Hix
Represented By: Neil Douglas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Thaxter James
Represented By: Paul Joseph Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Batton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Mannello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Douzdjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos Barrera
Represented By: Philip Burkhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batton TechnicalEngineering Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanbon-Caro I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanbon--MI I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanbon--MI II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanbon--Marlette, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanbon--PA I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanbon-CT I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tec Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deploy Hr, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deployhr, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?