Ascarie et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sharon Ascarie, Michael Ascarie, Shadi Ascarie and Mahmoud Ascarie
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv01572
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING 85 REQUEST TO VACATE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re Letter from Plaintiff Mahmoud Ascarie and Setting Briefing Schedule on Same. Responses due by 8/16/2013. Replies due by 8/30/2013.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/31/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 82 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 41. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 05/17/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE FOR 66 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Responses due by 4/5/2013. Replies due by 4/8/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 60 STIPULATION RE: JOINT ADR SELECTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT REMAINDER OF DEFENDANT'S 52 MOTION From Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 10/17/2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 35 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S UNDERWRITING FILES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Approving 32 Joint Declination for Reassignment to a Magistrate Judge). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 28 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT TO THE SAN JOSE DIVISION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascarie et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ascarie
Represented By: Anthony Edward Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ascarie
Represented By: Anthony Edward Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shadi Ascarie
Represented By: Anthony Edward Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmoud Ascarie
Represented By: Anthony Edward Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary T. Lafayette
Represented By: Sasha Lankarani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?