Zylka v. Discover Bank et al
Plaintiff: Faye S. Zylka
Defendant: Discover Bank, Trans Union LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01589
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/23/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re appearance of party rep for Discover Bank (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/12/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER (1) REQUIRING ADDITIONAL SETTLEMENT INFORMATION AND (2) DENYING DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/10/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re request to appear by phone and deadlines for submission of settlement papers (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting DB Servicing's request to appear at mediation by phone.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/14/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/13/2012. (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/11/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice between Plaintiff and Defendant Trans Union LLC, Trans Union LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 08/16/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zylka v. Discover Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye S. Zylka
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Tomio Buck Narita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Sumana Cooppan
Represented By: William R. Brown
Represented By: Amanda E. Glowacki
Represented By: Angela L. Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Angela M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?