Collier v. The Vallejo Water Co.
Plaintiff: Donald T. Collier
Defendant: The Vallejo Water Co.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01635
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER related case to C-13-0755 EDL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/19/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. The Vallejo Water Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald T. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vallejo Water Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?