United States of America v. $24,500 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $24,500 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2012cv01724
Filed: April 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by United States of America. Status Report due by 11/15/2013. Status Conference reset for 11/22/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/26/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Seeking Further Stay of Action) filed by United States of America. Status Conference reset for 8/23/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting : 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Seeking Further Stay of Action) filed by United States of America. Status Conference set for 4/19/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/6/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Seeking Stay of Action) filed by United States of America. Case Management Conference reset for 12/7/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $24,500 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie M. Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,500 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?