Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Salazar et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity and Jeff Miller
Defendant: Dan Ashe, Ken Salazar and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 3:2012cv01767
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 Letter filed by Ken Salazar, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Dan Ashe for Ethan Eddy to appear by phone on 11/16/12 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/13/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting re 35 Letter filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Jeff Miller for Collette Giese to appear by phone on 11/16/12 at 1:30 PM for the case management conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/7/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING re 28 Letter filed by Ken Salazar, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Dan Ashe for Ethan Eddy to appear by phone on 9/21/12 at 1:30 PM for the further case management conference.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING re 26 Letter filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Jeff Miller for Collette Giese to appear by phone on 9/21/12 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/11/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/5/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ashe
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Ethan Carson Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Collette Lucille Adkins Giese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Miller
Represented By: Justin Augustine
Represented By: Collette Lucille Adkins Giese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?