Tucker v. City of Richmond et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Tucker
Defendant: City of Richmond, Charles Whitney and Stina Johanson
Case Number: 3:2012cv01829
Filed: April 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/28/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/11/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 8 Stipulation (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. City of Richmond et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond
Represented By: David Blake Newdorf
Represented By: Vicki Francine Van Fleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stina Johanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Tucker
Represented By: Bennett Roger Glen
Represented By: Ben Glen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?