Department of Fair Employment and Housing v. Law School Admission Council Inc
Plaintiff: Department of Fair Employment and Housing
Defendant: Law School Admission Council Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv01830
Filed: April 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 282 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 250 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 276 Administrative Motion to Strike; and granting in part 254 Motion for Contempt or to Alter Consent Decree. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER regarding unredacted chambers copies. If Plaintiff DFEH would like the Court to consider information not filed in the public record, DFEH must file a motion to file under seal no later than November 6, 2017. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 30, 2017. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 220 Appeal of Panel Report. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Hon. Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER REGARDING RESPONSIVE BRIEFS TO AMICUS CURIAE LETTER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 228 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 227 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, to Hearing Date filed by United States of America, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 228 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 227 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, to Hearing Date, 220 MOTION Appeal from Panel's Recommended "Best Practices" . Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER re RESPONSIVE BRIEF TO AMICAS CURIAE LETTER 222 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 214 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Briefing Schedule filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 206 joint motion for administrative relief; terminating 207 Discovery Letter Brief (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER RE: ROGER PUDLIN'S LETTER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/29/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 180 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change Status Conference filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Status Report due by 1/30/2014. Status Conference reset for 2/6/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 164 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's DFEH's Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing. 11/7/13 motion hearing vacated.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Denying 151 Defendant's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER re Supplemental Briefing for 151 Defendant's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/12/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re Briefing Schedule for 151 Defendant's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 141 Discovery Letter Brief (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 106 DFEH's Motion to Proceed for Group or Class Relief. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 81 Individual Plaintiff-Intervenors' Motion to Amend. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 118 Plaintiff's Motion to File Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiff DFEH is required to E-FILE the amended document. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on March 26, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER re [111-2] Proposed Order, filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on March 15, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER re [111-1] Stipulations re order re discovery filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Status Conference and Hearing filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Status Con ference and Hearing, 81 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Intervenor Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF-INTERVENORS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT, 106 MOTION Motion to Proceed for Group or Class Re lief . Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 87 DFEH's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; DFEH is required to E-FILE the amended document. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on February 4, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER re 84 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion For Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Department of Fair Employment and Housing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/16/13. (emclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Re Parties' Letters. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 Joint Motion to Reschedule CMC; [Proposed] Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/29/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 42 Motion to Intervene by Legal Aid Society - Employment Law Center. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/18/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Law School Admission Council Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/25/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Using Fictitious Names. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Re 39 Request for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 08/07/2012. (emclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS TO 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/21/2012. Replies due by 6/28/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Department of Fair Employment and Housing v. Law School Admission Council Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Department of Fair Employment and Housing
Represented By: Susan Marie Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law School Admission Council Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Burgoyne
Represented By: Julie Marie Capell
Represented By: Robert Eugene Darby
Represented By: Caroline Mew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?