Scott v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Danisha Scott
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv01835
Filed: April 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 06/26/2013. (lblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO INFORM COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/14/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danisha Scott
Represented By: Steven Matthew Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Brenda Maureen Pullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?