In Re: Plant Insulation, Co.
Appellant: Granite State Insurance Company, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Insurance Company of the West, Transport Insurance Company, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company, United States Fire Insurance Company, ACE Fire Insurance Company, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Safety National Casualty Corporation, American Home Assurance Company, American Automobile Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company and OneBeacon Insurance Company
Miscellaneous: Thomas E. Carlson
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 3:2012cv01887
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER REMANDING TO THE BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/25/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DENYING STAY PENDING APPEAL TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting leave to file documents under seal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/30/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 111 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER FOR BRIEFING AND ARGUMENT REGARDING APPELLANTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A STAY PENDING APPEAL TO THE NINTH CIRCUIT. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER AFFIRMING CONFIRMATION OF RESTATED SECOND AMENDED PLAN OF REORGANIZATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 SCHEDULING ORDER. Pending motions set for 9/5/12 at 10:00 a.m. as to 59 MOTION to Strike 36 Appellant's Brief Plan Proponents' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike U.S. Fire's Opening Brief on Appeal; Memorandum of Poi nts and Authorities in Support Thereof, 79 MOTION Supplement Record On Appeal Appellants Notice of Motion and Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING STIPULATION RE: EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING BRIEFS BY AMENDMENT TO STIPULATION RE: DISTRICT COURT REVIEW OF ORDER CONFIRMING THE RESTATED SECOND AMENDED PLAN OR REORGANIZATION OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Plant Insulation, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Jeff Carlisle
Represented By: Rosemary H Do
Represented By: David Keane Morrison
Represented By: Randall James Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: R. Jeff Carlisle
Represented By: Rosemary H Do
Represented By: David Keane Morrison
Represented By: Randall James Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Insurance Company of the West
Represented By: Eugenie Gifford Baumann
Represented By: Valerie Ann Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Transport Insurance Company
Represented By: Ray L. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company
Represented By: Andrew T. Frankel
Represented By: Kathrine A. McLendon
Represented By: Deborah Lynn Stein
Represented By: Mark Thompson
Represented By: Craig S. Waldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Tabb
Represented By: Chad A. Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ACE Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan S. Berman
Represented By: Jaclyn Ann Blankenship
Represented By: Richard Blair Goetz
Represented By: Patricia Hsue
Represented By: Tancred V. Schiavoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan S. Berman
Represented By: Jaclyn Ann Blankenship
Represented By: Richard Blair Goetz
Represented By: Patricia Hsue
Represented By: Tancred V. Schiavoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Safety National Casualty Corporation
Represented By: Philip Richard Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: R. Jeff Carlisle
Represented By: Michael S. Davis
Represented By: Rosemary H Do
Represented By: David Keane Morrison
Represented By: Randall James Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: American Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Martha Kay Martin
Represented By: Cynthia L. Kendrick
Represented By: Leslie A. Davis
Represented By: Lynn H. Murray
Represented By: Mark David Plevin
Represented By: Tacie H. Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Tacie H. Yoon
Represented By: Mark David Plevin
Represented By: Lynn H. Murray
Represented By: Martha Kay Martin
Represented By: Cynthia L. Kendrick
Represented By: Leslie A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: OneBeacon Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul E.B. Glad
Represented By: Robert Millner
Represented By: Joel Thomas Muchmore
Represented By: Philip Aloysius O'Connell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Thomas E. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Steven Benjamin Sacks
Represented By: Michael H. Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?