Orozco v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Orozco
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Ryan Jones, Arnaldo Aleman, Mike Moran, Eric Tapang, Gabriel Rivera, Michael Duderoff and Derek Christianson
Case Number: 3:2012cv01900
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: The order to show cause issued against Jessica Orozco on 8/8/2013 is withdrawn re [Docket 41] Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/19/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Settlement Conferences for both actions C-12-1900-JCS and C-12-2443-SBA shall be conducted jointly on 4/22/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Settlement Conferences briefs and exhibits as to Orozco v. City and County of San Francisco, et al C-12-1900-JCS are to be lodged with Judge Ryu no later than 4/18/13 5:00 p.m. re 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Jessica Orozco filed by Jessica Orozco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/18/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013) Modified on 4/18/2013 (ig, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING re 18 Joint Case Management Statement and Stipulated Request To Continue Further Case Management Conference filed by City and County of San Francisco. Updated Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2013. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 3/15/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/11/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orozco v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Orozco
Represented By: Edward Charles Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Jones
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaldo Aleman
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Moran
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Tapang
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Rivera
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Duderoff
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Christianson
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?