Knapp et al v. City of Rohnert Park et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Knapp, Samuel Knapp and Karen Knapp
Defendant: Charles Larson, "FNU" Ager, Jeff Justice, City of Rohnert Park, Brian Masterson and Ryan Foiles
Case Number: 3:2012cv01917
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The court orders the administrative closure of this case. A party may reopen the case for enforcement of the settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/17/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU FOR SUPERVISION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 23 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED Protective Order re 19 Proposed Order filed by Ryan Foiles, Brian Masterson, City of Rohnert Park, "FNU" Ager, Charles Larson, Jeff Justice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012) Modified on 12/14/2012 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/16/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/3/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 7 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp et al v. City of Rohnert Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "FNU" Ager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rohnert Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Foiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Knapp
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Knapp
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Knapp
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?