Wine Bottle Recycling LLC v. Niagra Systems LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wine Bottle Recycling LLC
Defendant: Niagra Systems LLC, South Shore Systems LLC, Niagara Custom Built Manufacturing, J. Chris Langmack, Clark Langmack, George Strekal and Richard J. Stark
Case Number: 3:2012cv01924
Filed: April 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Trial Setting/Status Conference. Status Report due by 11/7/2014. Trial Setting/Status Conference set for 11/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/17/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re: SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on February 21, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/10/2014 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on January 3, 2014. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/12/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/22/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER clarifying 83 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Order on Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on September 26, 2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 12 South Shore LLC, S.A. Langmack Company, and Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and GRANTING 18 Defendant Niagara Systems LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Denying 35 Ex Parte Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Wine Bottle Recycling LLC. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/11/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wine Bottle Recycling LLC v. Niagra Systems LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wine Bottle Recycling LLC
Represented By: Kathleen A. Umrein
Represented By: Lyman D. Bedford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagra Systems LLC
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Shore Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niagara Custom Built Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chris Langmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Langmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Strekal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?