Scott v. Pfizer Pharmaceutical
Plaintiff: Harril Glen Scott
Defendant: Pfizer Pharmaceuticals
Case Number: 3:2012cv02033
Filed: April 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/28/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying (69) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:12-cv-02033-CRB. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (52) in case 3:12-cv-02033-CRB. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying (47) Motion to Appoint Expert; denying (48) Motion Requesting Documents and Things in case 3:12-cv-02033-CRB. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 44 Motion to Compel; denying 45 Motion to Appoint Expert. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying (34) Motion Requesting Production of Documents and Things; granting (40) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 3:12-cv-02033-CRB. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying (37) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 3:12-cv-02033-CRB. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (29) Motion to Introduce Evidence; granting (30) Motion for Extension of Time in case 3:12-cv-02033-CRB. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Pfizer Pharmaceutical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harril Glen Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?