Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated et al v. N.R. Hamm Quarry, LLC
Plaintiff: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Jason David Glidden and Verlin Olen Dobkins
Defendant: N.R. Hamm Quarry, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv02127
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT JOINT STATEMENT RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S.White on 12/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 STIPULATION RE: Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION RE: Scheduling. Replies due by 11/9/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 32 STIPULATION RE SCHEDULING AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/29/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 15 Stipulation and Scheduling Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 23, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated et al v. N.R. Hamm Quarry, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Robin Michael Wall
Represented By: Jonathan Rosenberg
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Bednark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason David Glidden
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Bednark
Represented By: Jonathan Rosenberg
Represented By: Robin Michael Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlin Olen Dobkins
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Bednark
Represented By: Jonathan Rosenberg
Represented By: Robin Michael Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.R. Hamm Quarry, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?