Clements v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Shelly A. Clements
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02179
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING 79 MOTION for Leave to File filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 6, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING re 56 Letter filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. for Stephen Meinertzhagen to appear by phone on 1/17/14 at 9:30 AM.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/13/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING STAY UNTIL THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/8/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/15/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay Case Pending Mediation and to Set Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. The case management conference set for 8/31/12 at 1:30 PM shall remain on calendar as scheduled. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/9/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/23/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clements v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly A. Clements
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Thomas Eric Loeser
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Zachary J. Alinder
Represented By: Peter Obstler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?