Sony Electronics Inc. et al v. Hannstar Display Corp.
Plaintiff: Sony Electronics Inc. and Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corp.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02214
Filed: May 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - No. C 12-2214 SI 8595 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8563) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation Re Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 8501 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER OVERRULING HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATION'S OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE DISCOVERY - No. 12cv2214 SI 8085 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE: MOTION OF DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL SONY ENTITIES TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATION'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE BREACH OF CONTRACT CLAIM WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 6841 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATION'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE BREACH OF CONTRACT AND FRAUD CLAIMS, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (SONY) 6060 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; 16 in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sony Electronics Inc. et al v. Hannstar Display Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Electronics Inc.
Represented By: David Mark Goldstein, Esq.
Represented By: Stephen V. Bomse
Represented By: Shannon Christine Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
Represented By: Stephen V. Bomse
Represented By: David Mark Goldstein, Esq.
Represented By: Shannon Christine Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?