Vossekuil v. Wells Fargo Home Loan et al
Plaintiff: Ruben Vossekuil
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Loan, Wachovia Mortgage and Regional Trustee Services
Case Number: 3:2012cv02298
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/3/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/18/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/13/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/5/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vossekuil v. Wells Fargo Home Loan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Vossekuil
Represented By: Shaneil Sharma
Represented By: Ravi Krishna Sakthivel
Represented By: Luis Walters Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Loan
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Trustee Services
Represented By: Nicolas Adam Daluiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?