Arch Insurance Company v. Dignity Health et al
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Defendant: Dignity Health and Mercy General Hospital
Case Number: 3:2012cv02369
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/17/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arch Insurance Company v. Dignity Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Dean J. McElroy
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Represented By: Amanda Marie Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy General Hospital
Represented By: Amanda Marie Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?