Rojo
Plaintiff: James E. Rojo
Case Number: 3:2012cv02518
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 83 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Under Rule 59(E).(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 71 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SUA SPONTE RECONSIDERING PREVIOUS ORDER; CHANGING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT BRIGHT'S DISPOSITIVE MOTION. Motions terminated: 50 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Darren Bright, Kalisher. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/8/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF SERVICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES 4 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Rojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?