Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Quintanilla et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Luis Quintanilla and Odilia Quintanilla
Case Number: 3:2012cv02581
Filed: May 17, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REMANDING CASE., ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/24/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/18/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Referring Case for Related Case Determination. Compare C12-02581 LB with C11-01044 SBA. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/25/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Quintanilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Quintanilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odilia Quintanilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Rebecca L. Carle
Represented By: Gayle Eileen Jameson
Represented By: Anne Ogle-Knee
Represented By: Jessica Laraine Partridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?