CSR Technology, Inc. v. Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Plaintiff: CSR Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02619
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 AMENDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 23, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement filed by CSR Technology, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 24, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FIFTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF RELATED TO U.S. PATENT NO 6,882,827 AND RELATED COUNTERCLAIMS re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 27, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2; ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 60 Joint Case Management Statement. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 40 MOTION to Compel Patent L.R. 3-1 Disclosures. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 40 MOTION to Compel Patent L.R. 3-1 Disclosures. Responses due by 1/14/2013. Replies due by 1/24/2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 7, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 40 MOTION to Compel Patent L.R. 3-1 Disclosures filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. Responses due by 1/10/2013. Replies due by 1/17/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2013 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 of Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims and Counterclaims Concerning U.S. Patent No. 6,757,324 between CSR Technology Inc. and Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 33 ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Claim Construction Hearing set for 7/17/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/28/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSR Technology, Inc. v. Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSR Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Fuehrer
Represented By: Mark Fowler
Represented By: Summer Kristen Krause
Represented By: Timothy Lohse
Represented By: Michael Gerald Schwartz
Represented By: Aaron Wainscoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Michael, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?