Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Hong et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Seong Hoon Hong, David Chiu, Jin Young Kim, Jung Min Mok, Young Ho Won, Sangchol An, Chang K. Chang, Sung Sang Cho, Harry Mook Choi, Yong Oh Choi, Tony Huey, Chong Kim, Jung Kim and Bhupendra Patel
Case Number: 3:2012cv02658
Filed: May 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/17/15. (nap, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 109 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SEPTEMBER 17, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 5, 2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting 105 Joint Case Management Statement. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2014; Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/28/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 103 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE APRIL 2, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JUNE 4, 2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING ((33 and 38 in case 4:13-cv-00777-CW); (29 in case 4:13-cv-01029-CW); and (30 in case 4:13-cv-01769-CW )) CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING TRIAL DATES.(denying (99 in case 4:12-cv-02658-CW); (50 in case 4:13-cv-00777-CW); (38 on case 4:13-cv-01769-CW); (39 in case 4:13-cv-1769-CW) Stipulation) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 97 Stipulation Continuing All Current Case Deadlines and Court Dates Pending Finalization of Settlement Agreement (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 91 Stipulation Continuing Pending Court Dates and Expert Discovery Deadlines. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 87 Amended Stipulated Protective Order (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 77 Stipulation REQUESTING CONTINUING FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF FOR SOLE PURPOSE OF PREVIOUSLY NOTICED DEPOSITIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 74 STIPULATION REQUESTING TO CONTINUE FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF FOR TWO WEEKS FOR THE SOLE PURPOSE OF COMPLETING ALREADY NOTICED DEPOSITIONS (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES IN INSURANCE COVERAGE ACTIONS (L.R. 6-2(a)); DECLARATION OF WILLIAM C.MORISON. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/11/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SUA SPONTE ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/30/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING Further Settlement Conference in 4:12-cv-02658 CW. The Court also MODIFIES the settlement conference in 4:13-cv-00777 YGR to be telephonic, for counsel only, commencing 5/16/2013 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/10/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 57 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/18/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Hong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J. Barron
Represented By: Gina Marie Fornario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seong Hoon Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Young Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung Min Mok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Ho Won
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sangchol An
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang K. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung Sang Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Mook Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yong Oh Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Huey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chong Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhupendra Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?