Egger v. County of Humboldt et al
Plaintiff: Janelle Egger
Defendant: County of Humboldt and Humboldt County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 3:2012cv02671
Filed: May 24, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ON STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Motions terminated: 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Janelle Egger. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/9/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/17/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Janelle Egger. Reset Hearing as to 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 8/3/2012. Motion Hearing reset for 8/24/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/24/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/5/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (Stipulation to adjust briefing schedule with regard to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction). Reset Deadlines as to 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 6/28/2012. Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 7/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to adjust briefing schedule re 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 6 Renotice motion hearing to Adjust Injunction Briefing Schedule filed by County of Humboldt. Reset Deadlines 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 6/14/2012. Replies due by 6/21/2012.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Egger v. County of Humboldt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Egger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Humboldt
Represented By: Jefferson Bryan Billingsley
Represented By: David Ezra Kahn
Represented By: Randy Edward Riddle
Represented By: Teresa Lynn Stricker
Represented By: Albert Seung-Kyu Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt County Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?