Davis et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Davis and Susan Davis
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., DePuy International, Ltd., Thomas P. Schmalzried, Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation and DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02700
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONDITIONAL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. IN RE: DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC., PINNACLE HIP IMPLANT PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. MDL No. 2244. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 6/12/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. The parties' request for a stay of proceedings is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 13, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/1/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Represented By: Alexander Gerard Calfo
Represented By: Kelley Spencer Olah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Represented By: Alexander Gerard Calfo
Represented By: Kelley Spencer Olah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International, Ltd.
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Represented By: Alexander Gerard Calfo
Represented By: Kelley Spencer Olah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Schmalzried
Represented By: Ralph Campillo
Represented By: Wendy Anne Tucker
Represented By: Michael Martin Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation
Represented By: Wendy Anne Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Represented By: Kelley Spencer Olah
Represented By: Alexander Gerard Calfo
Represented By: Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Davis
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Seeger
Represented By: Adam Richard Salvas
Represented By: Brian J. Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Davis
Represented By: Kenneth Mark Seeger
Represented By: Brian J. Devine
Represented By: Adam Richard Salvas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?