Ua Cruadhlaoich v. Bryson
Plaintiff: Matthew A. I. Ua Cruadhlaoich
Defendant: John E. Bryson
Case Number: 3:2012cv02723
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER REGARDING RULE 56(d) Motion(edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ADOPTING PROPOSED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE on 12/17/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 55 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO CONDUCT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING: 21 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING, AS MODIFIED, 12 Defendant's Administrative Motion to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 29, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/14/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ua Cruadhlaoich v. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew A. I. Ua Cruadhlaoich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?