The Sherwin-Williams Company v. L.A. Smith & Sons Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Defendant: L.A. Smith & Sons Inc. and Kirk Smith
Case Number: 3:2012cv02761
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND RETAINING JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 17, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/18/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 9/27/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/5/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Sherwin-Williams Company v. L.A. Smith & Sons Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Robert Randy Wertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A. Smith & Sons Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?