GPNE Corp. v. Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Plaintiff: GPNE Corp.
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02884
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING CHANGE IN TIME FOR TUTORIAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 5, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 25, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:12-cv-02884-LHK; granting (70) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:12-cv-03056-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:12-cv-03056-LHK, 5:12-cv-02884-LHK, 5:12-cv-02885-LHK, 5:12-cv-03055-LHK, 5:12-cv-03057-LHK(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on February 5, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 40 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GPNE Corp. v. Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPNE Corp.
Represented By: Alexandra Capachietti
Represented By: Barry J. Bumgardner
Represented By: Stephen Y. Chow
Represented By: Randall Garteiser
Represented By: Zachary R. Gates
Represented By: Steven W. Hartsell
Represented By: Christopher Alan Honea
Represented By: Jordon Jun Kimura
Represented By: Robert G. Klein
Represented By: Kenneth J. Mansfield
Represented By: Shaun M. Mukai
Represented By: Paul T. Muniz
Represented By: Howard J. Susser
Represented By: Merton E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Hayes
Represented By: Louise K.Y. Ing
Represented By: Malia E. Kakos
Represented By: Robert E. Krebs
Represented By: Ronald Frank Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?