Hayes v. Donahoe
Plaintiff: Michael G. Hayes
Defendant: Patrick Donahoe
Case Number: 3:2012cv02964
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/23/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/16/2014. Case Management Conference set for May 20, 2014 is VACATED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/28/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/13/12. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?