AMEC Environment & Infrastructure, Inc. v. Geosyntec Consultants Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AMEC Environment & Infrastructure, Inc.
Defendant: Geosyntec Consultants Inc., Anton Arulanantham, Robert Cheung, Brian McNamara, Joseph Niland, Syed Rehan and Bruce Travers
Case Number: 3:2012cv02973
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/24/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re 45 46 discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/26/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER to File First Amended Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/05/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by AMEC Environment & Infrastructure, Inc.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/21/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMEC Environment & Infrastructure, Inc. v. Geosyntec Consultants Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geosyntec Consultants Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton Arulanantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Rehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Travers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMEC Environment & Infrastructure, Inc.
Represented By: Aengus Hartley Carr
Represented By: Matthew F. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?