Martinez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Monica Martinez
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2012cv02997
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 27 Motion for Attorney Fees (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 20 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Extend Time for Dft to file answer is extended from 12/10/12 to 1/10/13. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/10/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Martinez
Represented By: Donald Harrison Medearis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?