Tavares et al v. Capitol Records, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Vierra Tavares, Arthur Paul Tavares, Feliciano Vierra Tavares, Antone Lawrence Tavares and Perry Lee Tavares
Defendant: Capitol Records, LLC, EMI Group Limited, EMI Group, Inc., EMI RM US, Inc. and EMI Music North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv03059
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/5/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Capitol Records, Inc. shall file and serve its answer to the First Amended Complaint no later than April 2, 2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING 1/7/2013 CMC AND RESETTING Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Motions terminated: 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/26/12. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2012 is VACATED. Case Management Conference reset to 1/7/2013 at 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/16/12. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavares et al v. Capitol Records, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Vierra Tavares
Represented By: Thomas Sean McNamara
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Paul Tavares
Represented By: Thomas Sean McNamara
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feliciano Vierra Tavares
Represented By: Thomas Sean McNamara
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antone Lawrence Tavares
Represented By: Thomas Sean McNamara
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Lee Tavares
Represented By: Thomas Sean McNamara
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Records, LLC
Represented By: Richard Christian Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Christian Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI RM US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Music North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?