Sloan v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shuron Sloan
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03221
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE RE 21 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/15/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 18 Order, Set Hearings,, filed by Shuron Sloan Parties must file Stipulation of Dismissal by 1/11/2013 or appear to show cause why case should not be dismissed on 1/16/2013 at 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 12/21/2012. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 12/14/2012 or shall appear on 12/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, and show cause why the case should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/25/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sloan v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuron Sloan
Represented By: G. Thomas Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Ian Dalby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?