Cortez-Wyrsch v. Philippine Airlines, Incorporated

Plaintiff: Imogene Cortez-Wyrsch
Defendant: Philippine Airlines, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2012cv03282
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Dismissal or Statement due by 10/21/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 19, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 9, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 25 Notice (Other) filed by Philippine Airlines, Incorporated. Dismissal or Statement due by 9/19/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
April 10, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Stipulation to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Dkt. No. 15). Discovery Hearing set for 4/4/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/25/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez-Wyrsch v. Philippine Airlines, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imogene Cortez-Wyrsch
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philippine Airlines, Incorporated
Represented By: Geneva A. Collins
Represented By: Kevin Richard Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?