Santos v. Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Isabel Santos
Defendant: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. and NDEX West, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv03296
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/29/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Trial date and deadlines. Jury Selection set for 4/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2014 09:30 AM before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/04/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Trial Date. Jury Trial set for 2/18/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Jury Selection set for 2/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/31/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 58 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/03/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order requesting supplemental declarations regarding cross motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/19/2013. (sclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 35 Motion for Civil Contempt Sanctions.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER Enlarging Deadlines and Rescheduling Trial. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 11/18/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/2/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013) Modified on 7/3/2013 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing and Designation of Experts Date. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 35 MOTION for Hearing for Civil Contempt Sanctions and Attorney's Fees and Costs. Responses due by 6/26/2013. Replies due by 7/5/2013. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/29/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Parties to Complete ADR by May 31, 2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/20/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 12 Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Santos
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Hanecak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Represented By: Thomas K Agawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Represented By: Thomas K Agawa
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?