Mishou v. Paco Ventures LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Mishou
Defendant: Paco Ventures LLC and Techno Drill Design Ltd
Case Number: 3:2012cv03331
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO TECHNO DRILL HOLDINGS with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/22/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed in its entirety, except as to the severed claims of the defaulted party Techno Drill Holdings, with prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to thi s Court, within sixty (60) days, with proof of service of a copy thereon to opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this case shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/13/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re 159 Letter filed by Pacific Coast Drilling Company, Inc., for Helen McFarland to appear by phone on 5/9/14 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/8/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING re 156 Letter filed by MF Equipment Limited for Mike Gibbs to appear by phone on 5/9/14 at 2:00 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 4/30/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING re 152 Letter filed by Techno Drill, LLC, for John Waite to appear by phone on 5/9/14 at 2:00 PM. Mr. Waite shall use the conference call number and pass code that will be arranged by the Law Offices of Melissa Ballard. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/29/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER, signed 3/14/14, re 145 Letter filed by Pacific Coast Drilling Company, Inc. for Helen McFarland to appear by phone on 3/14/14 at 2:00 PM. Ms. McFarland shall participate by using the conference call number and pass code. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/14/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER, signed as modified on 3/12/14, re 142 Letter filed by RigKits, LLC for Randy Moss to appear by phone on 3/14/14 at 2:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/12/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING re 137 Letter filed by Valentine Corporation for Zach Tolson to appear by phone on 3/14/14. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/11/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING re 128 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Casagrande S.p.A., Casagrande USA. Michael Descalso subsitutes in a counsel of record in lieau of Michael T. Gibbs. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/28/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER, signed 8/26/13, re 108 Letter filed by MF Equipment Limited, Casagrande S.p.A., Casagrande USA for Michael T. Gibbs to appear by phone on 9/20/13.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/26/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING re 77 Letter filed by MF Equipment Limited, Casagrande S.p.A., Casagrande USA for Michael Gibbs to appear by phone on 8/16/13 at 1:30 PM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/26/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING re 61 Letter filed by MF Equipment Limited, Casagrande S.p.A., Casagrande USA for Michael Gibbs to appear by phone for the cmc on 4/19/13 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/15/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT as to Dft Techno Drill Holdings. Time extended to 11/16/2013. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/7/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Paco Ventures LLC Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/26/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mishou v. Paco Ventures LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paco Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techno Drill Design Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Mishou
Represented By: Christopher Alain Viadro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?